NY A09968 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s9153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s9153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the health savings account pilot program to December 31, 2027.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the health savings account pilot program to December 31, 2027.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s9153 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.206 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.206 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S09153 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - returned to senate