NY A09518 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - signed chap.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - signed chap.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Twin Cities Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Twin Cities Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.84 |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.828 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7223 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.96 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07223 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9518