NY A09415 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "Veterans Mental Health and Chemical Dependency Act"; directs the veterans affairs commission to develop and update a New York state interagency plan to improve outreach, assessment and care for veterans and their families who are experiencing mental health, major depression and/or substance abuse problems; requires a report be issued each year after the effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "Veterans Mental Health and Chemical Dependency Act"; directs the veterans affairs commission to develop and update a New York state interagency plan to improve outreach, assessment and care for veterans and their families who are experiencing mental health, major depression and/or substance abuse problems; requires a report be issued each year after the effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senateapproval memo.15
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.463
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.895
2012-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6640
2012-05-23SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2012-05-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-05-23Assemblypassed assembly
2012-05-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.596
2012-05-15Assemblyreported
2012-05-01Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-02-29Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S06640 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9415

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback