NY S06640 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Veterans Mental Health and Chemical Dependency Act"; directs the veterans affairs commission to develop and update a New York state interagency plan to improve outreach, assessment and care for veterans and their families who are experiencing mental health, major depression and/or substance abuse problems; requires a report be issued each year after the effective date.
Title
Enacts the "Veterans Mental Health and Chemical Dependency Act"; directs the veterans affairs commission to develop and update a New York state interagency plan to improve outreach, assessment and care for veterans and their families who are experiencing mental health, major depression and/or substance abuse problems; requires a report be issued each year after the effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9415 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.895 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A09415 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - approval memo.15