NY A09157 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to retaliation against other jurisdictions which discriminate against hiring New York state residents.
Title
Relates to retaliation against other jurisdictions which discriminate against hiring New York state residents.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.847 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental employees |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | print number 9157a |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07750 (Same As) 2014-06-04 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS