NY A08646 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts hot tubs or spas with safety covers from certain provisions of law.
Title
Exempts hot tubs or spas with safety covers from certain provisions of law.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | approval memo.33 |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | signed chap.651 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.821 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7858 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.554 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07858 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8646