NY A08560 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the membership of the marine and coastal district of New York conservation, education and research board; relates to recreational marine fishing licenses.
Title
Increases the membership of the marine and coastal district of New York conservation, education and research board; relates to recreational marine fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | tabled | |
2010-08-30 | vetoed memo.6777 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-22 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | 3RD READING CAL.864 | |
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6110A | |
2010-03-18 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | |
2010-03-18 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-18 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-22 | amended on third reading (t) 8560b | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.610 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.175 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-02 | print number 8560a | |
2009-06-02 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-28 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S6110-A (Same As) 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8560B