NY A08549 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of gender-neutral terminology on state websites for website content that is created or modified after a certain date.
Title
Relates to the use of gender-neutral terminology on state websites for website content that is created or modified after a certain date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8090 |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.257 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08090 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.21