NY A08422 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6724
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6724
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use as parkland of a portion of Corporal Fischer park in the borough of the Bronx and to sell and convey such land upon terms and conditions to facilitate the construction of affordable housing.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use as parkland of a portion of Corporal Fischer park in the borough of the Bronx and to sell and convey such land upon terms and conditions to facilitate the construction of affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6724 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.577 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06724 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.331