NY S06724 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use as parkland of a portion of Corporal Fischer park in the borough of the Bronx and to sell and convey such land upon terms and conditions to facilitate the construction of affordable housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue the use as parkland of a portion of Corporal Fischer park in the borough of the Bronx and to sell and convey such land upon terms and conditions to facilitate the construction of affordable housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.331
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.577
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8422
2017-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-20SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2094
2017-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08422 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6724

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback