NY A08250 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-08 - print number 8250c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-08 - print number 8250c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes when a used car dealer has to refund a consumer his or her money for failing to correct a malfunction or defect as required by the warranty.
Title
Establishes when a used car dealer has to refund a consumer his or her money for failing to correct a malfunction or defect as required by the warranty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Assembly | print number 8250c |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-25 | Assembly | print number 8250b |
2012-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | print number 8250a |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06872 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - referred to codes