NY A07805 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to municipal sustainable energy loan programs.
Title
Relates to municipal sustainable energy loan programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.184 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a7805c |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.798 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6523A |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s6523a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.309 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | print number 7805c |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | print number 7805b |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7805a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06523 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184