NY S06523 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to municipal sustainable energy loan programs.
Title
Relates to municipal sustainable energy loan programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.184 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7805c |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.798 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6523A |
2020-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07805 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.184