NY A07468 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - print number 7468a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - print number 7468a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care; requires the office to prepare a report detailing such.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care; requires the office to prepare a report detailing such.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 7468a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S03903 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3903A