NY S03903 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3903A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3903A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care; requires the office to prepare a report detailing such.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care; requires the office to prepare a report detailing such.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3903A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07468 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - print number 7468a