NY A07404 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - advanced to third reading cal.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - advanced to third reading cal.502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords from including additional services in a tenant's base rent; provides that additional services include cable television, internet services, garage usage and utilities.
Title
Prohibits landlords from including additional services in a tenant's base rent; provides that additional services include cable television, internet services, garage usage and utilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Wright [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.502 |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.509 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | referred to housing |