NY A07383 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for police officers employed by the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental protection in the city of New York transferring between the New York city employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for police officers employed by the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental protection in the city of New York transferring between the New York city employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.146 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1429 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5557A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.309 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | print number 7383a |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05557 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7383A