NY S05557 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7383A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7383A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for police officers employed by the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental protection in the city of New York transferring between the New York city employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Relates to the calculation of past service credit for police officers employed by the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental protection in the city of New York transferring between the New York city employees' retirement system to the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7383A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1429 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5557A |
2022-04-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.913 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07383 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - tabled