NY A07249 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides technical corrections to provisions concerning the adjudication of certain traffic violations.
Title
Provides technical corrections to provisions concerning the adjudication of certain traffic violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.373 |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |