NY A07109 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - print number 7109a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - print number 7109a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting certain restaurants and food establishments from serving foods containing artificial trans fat.
Title
Relates to prohibiting certain restaurants and food establishments from serving foods containing artificial trans fat.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Assembly | print number 7109a |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01967 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS