NY A06854 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish a program to purchase fresh produce from farms located in the state and distribute such fresh produce to correctional facilities in the state to be utilized in the provision of wholesome and nutritious food to incarcerated individuals.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish a program to purchase fresh produce from farms located in the state and distribute such fresh produce to correctional facilities in the state to be utilized in the provision of wholesome and nutritious food to incarcerated individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.857 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6810 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.167 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.167 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06810 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6854