NY A06748 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 6748b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 6748b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds cargo bicycles with electric assist to the types of bicycles with electric assist regulated under the vehicle and traffic law; provides that no person shall operate a cargo bicycle with electric assist unless it is accompanied by proof of financial security unless otherwise authorized by local law, ordinance, order, rule, or regulation or pursuant to an agreement made on behalf of the city, town, or village.
Title
Adds cargo bicycles with electric assist to the types of bicycles with electric assist regulated under the vehicle and traffic law; provides that no person shall operate a cargo bicycle with electric assist unless it is accompanied by proof of financial security unless otherwise authorized by local law, ordinance, order, rule, or regulation or pursuant to an agreement made on behalf of the city, town, or village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Assembly | print number 6748b |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 6748a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02757 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to transportation