NY A06581 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - substituted by s4943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - substituted by s4943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Seneca to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax until November 30, 2017.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Seneca to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax until November 30, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4943 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.707 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04943 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.198