NY A06527 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5151a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5151a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits schools or school districts from filing a lawsuit against a student's parent or guardian for unpaid meal fees.
Title
Prohibits schools or school districts from filing a lawsuit against a student's parent or guardian for unpaid meal fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s5151a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.215 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | print number 6527a |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05151 (Same As) 2021-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.315