NY S05151 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits schools or school districts from filing a lawsuit against a student's parent or guardian for unpaid meal fees.
Title
Prohibits schools or school districts from filing a lawsuit against a student's parent or guardian for unpaid meal fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.315 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6527a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1344 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5151A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06527 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5151a