NY A06480 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on October 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - signed chap.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on October 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - signed chap.521
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an individual with disabilities or a disabled veteran to hold full-time or part-time positions for purposes of eligibility for recruitment for state employment.
Title
Allows an individual with disabilities or a disabled veteran to hold full-time or part-time positions for purposes of eligibility for recruitment for state employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-05 | Assembly | signed chap.521 |
2023-10-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1316 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6482A |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.152 |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06482 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6480