NY S06482 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6480
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an individual with disabilities or a disabled veteran to hold full-time or part-time positions for purposes of eligibility for recruitment for state employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows an individual with disabilities or a disabled veteran to hold full-time or part-time positions for purposes of eligibility for recruitment for state employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6480
2023-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1316
2023-05-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 6482A
2023-05-05SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-04-24SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06480 (Same As) 2023-10-05 - signed chap.521

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback