NY A06417 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.312
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.312
Summary
This bill would allow the Dormitory Authority to finance construction of the YMCA of Greater Syracuse's facilities and those of their satellite branches.
Title
An act to amend the public authorities law, in relation to authorizing the dormitory authority to construct and finance certain facilities of the YMCA of Greater Syracuse
Sponsors
Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Jonathan Bing [D] | Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D] |
Asm. Joan Christensen [D] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.312 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-15 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-15 | 3RD READING CAL.543 | |
2009-07-15 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2610 | |
2009-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.195 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-03-03 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02610 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.312
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06417&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |