NY A06177 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "The Equity in Fertility Treatment Act"; relates to the definition of infertility and health insurance coverage for the treatment of infertility.
Title
Establishes "The Equity in Fertility Treatment Act"; relates to the definition of infertility and health insurance coverage for the treatment of infertility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | print number 6177a |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06118 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES