NY A06130 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Title
Enacts the "New York State fair pay act"; provides that it shall be an unlawful employment practice for an employer to discriminate between employees on the basis of sex, race and/or national origin by paying different wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2012-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.430 |
2012-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | print number 6130a |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | committed to labor |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.198 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.24 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.24 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02200 (Same As) 2012-04-30 - PRINT NUMBER 2200A