NY A05956 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - print number 5956a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - print number 5956a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits doctors of chiropractic to form limited liability companies.
Title
Permits doctors of chiropractic to form limited liability companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Assembly | print number 5956a |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01940 (Same As) 2013-06-05 - referred to higher education
S06414 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - referred to higher education
S06414 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - referred to higher education