NY A05657 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 5657a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 5657a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Joseph DelGiorno's eligibility to apply for a military service credit for his service in the Korean conflict.
Title
Authorizes Joseph DelGiorno's eligibility to apply for a military service credit for his service in the Korean conflict.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 5657a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04953 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4953A