NY A05243 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - print number 5243a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - print number 5243a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides bicycle access to public office buildings for state employees, contractors and visitors; requires the commissioner of general services to make an inventory of all existing bicycle parking and storage facilities at all state office buildings and office buildings in which the state leases or occupies space.
Title
Provides bicycle access to public office buildings for state employees, contractors and visitors; requires the commissioner of general services to make an inventory of all existing bicycle parking and storage facilities at all state office buildings and office buildings in which the state leases or occupies space.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Assembly | print number 5243a |
2012-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00625 (Same As) 2012-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 625A