NY A05128 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7782
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7782
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Title
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7782 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 5128c |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2012-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5128b |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.176 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.175 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | print number 5128a |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03093 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
A10781 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - referred to governmental operations
S07782 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.150
A10781 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - referred to governmental operations
S07782 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.150