NY S07782 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.150
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading cal.176
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a5128c
2012-06-21Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2012-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1499
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10781 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - referred to governmental operations
A05128 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7782

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback