NY A04301 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-5)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - print number 4301b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - print number 4301b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | print number 4301b | |
2010-06-01 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-01-12 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-05-14 | print number 4301a | |
2009-05-14 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-02-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-03 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S5204 (Same As) 2010-06-07 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING