NY A04017 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 4017a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 4017a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Chisholm Chance Act; creates centers of maternal and childcare services in Kings county and Bronx county to coordinate community-based organizations and community health workers to combat the maternal health crisis.
Title
Relates to the Chisholm Chance Act; creates centers of maternal and childcare services in Kings county and Bronx county to coordinate community-based organizations and community health workers to combat the maternal health crisis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | print number 4017a |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02898 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 2898A