NY A03996 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental conservation to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Title
Requires the department of environmental conservation to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.107 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.151 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.151 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |