NY A03988 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
Summary
Extends authorization of the county of Delaware to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
An act to amend the tax law, in relation to extending the authorization of the county of Delaware to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.96 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-06-04 | 3RD READING CAL.321 | |
2009-06-04 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4848 | |
2009-06-03 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2009-06-03 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-03 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-03 | home rule request | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.655 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-01-29 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04848 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
S50436 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64436 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65067 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50436 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64436 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65067 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03988&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |