NY S04848 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
Summary
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Delaware to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Delaware to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3988 | |
2009-05-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-13 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-12 | 1ST REPORT CAL.321 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03988 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.96
S50436 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64436 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65067 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50436 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64436 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65067 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04848&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |