NY A03758 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-13 - substituted by s1013b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-13 - substituted by s1013b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s1013b |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | print number 3758c |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | print number 3758b |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | print number 3758a |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01013 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.360