NY S01013 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.360 |
2013-09-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a3758c |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1013B |
2013-04-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1013A |
2013-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.245 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03758 (Same As) 2013-06-13 - substituted by s1013b