NY A03664 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-09 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to ensure that certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct issued pursuant to the correction law are correctly identified.
Title
Makes technical changes to ensure that certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct issued by the correction department are correctly identified and considered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-26 | print number 3664b | |
2010-01-26 | amend and recommit to correction | |
2010-01-19 | committed to correction | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.276 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.391 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4366A | |
2009-06-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-15 | repassed assembly | |
2009-06-04 | amended on third reading 3664a | |
2009-06-04 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2009-06-03 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-03 | RECOMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-06-03 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | |
2009-06-02 | recalled from senate | |
2009-05-26 | 3RD READING CAL.391 | |
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4366 | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.453 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-03-17 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-28 | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S4366-B (Same As) 2009-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3664