NY S04366 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3664
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3664
Summary
Makes technical changes to ensure that certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct issued by the correction department are correctly identified and considered.
Title
Makes technical changes to ensure that certificates of relief from disabilities and certificates of good conduct issued by the correction department are correctly identified and considered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3664 | |
2009-05-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.391 | |
2009-04-22 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A3664-B (Same As) 2010-03-09 - reported referred to ways and means
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04366&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |