NY A03521 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including credit unions and federal credit unions within the definition of bank, trust company or national bank for the purpose of the banking development district program (which was created to encourage the establishment of bank branches in geographic locations where there is a demonstrated need for banking services); relates to directing the banking board to promulgate rules and regulations to authorize the participation of credit unions and federal credit unions in such program; provides that for purposes of such program, a credit union may include in its membership any person or organization located within a local community, neighborhood or rural district where there is a demonstrated need for banking services.
Title
Relates to including credit unions and federal credit unions within the definition of bank, trust company or national bank for the purpose of the banking development district program (which was created to encourage the establishment of bank branches in geographic locations where there is a demonstrated need for banking services); relates to directing the banking board to promulgate rules and regulations to authorize the participation of credit unions and federal credit unions in such program; provides that for purposes of such program, a credit union may include in its membership any person or organization located within a local community, neighborhood or rural district where there is a demonstrated need for banking services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | print number 3521b |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | print number 3521a |
2015-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2015-01-23 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05521 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES