NY S05521 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including credit unions and federal credit unions within the definition of bank, trust company or national bank for the purpose of the banking development district program (which was created to encourage the establishment of bank branches in geographic locations where there is a demonstrated need for banking services); relates to directing the banking board to promulgate rules and regulations to authorize the participation of credit unions and federal credit unions in such program; provides that for purposes of such program, a credit union may include in its membership any person or organization located within a local community, neighborhood or rural district where there is a demonstrated need for banking services.
Title
Relates to including credit unions and federal credit unions within the definition of bank, trust company or national bank for the purpose of the banking development district program (which was created to encourage the establishment of bank branches in geographic locations where there is a demonstrated need for banking services); relates to directing the banking board to promulgate rules and regulations to authorize the participation of credit unions and federal credit unions in such program; provides that for purposes of such program, a credit union may include in its membership any person or organization located within a local community, neighborhood or rural district where there is a demonstrated need for banking services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5521A |
2016-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03521 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - ordered to third reading rules cal.153