NY A03441 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - print number 3441a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - print number 3441a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from operating a motor vehicle with children under the age of 8 in the front seat in most cases; makes limited exceptions.
Title
Prohibits a person from operating a motor vehicle with children under the age of 8 in the front seat in most cases; makes limited exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | print number 3441a |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02163 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 2163A