NY S02163 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 2163A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 2163A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from operating a motor vehicle with children under the age of 8 in the front seat in most cases; makes limited exceptions.
Title
Prohibits a person from operating a motor vehicle with children under the age of 8 in the front seat in most cases; makes limited exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2163A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03441 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - print number 3441a