NY A03419 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the establishment of a standard uniform anti-trafficking recognition training program and requires employees of hotel and gaming facilities to undergo such program.
Title
Mandates the establishment of a standard uniform anti-trafficking recognition training program and requires employees of hotel and gaming facilities to undergo such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.151 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.106 |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to economic development |