NY A03056 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes criminal liability for the failure to obtain medical care for a person in custody displaying medical distress.
Title
Imposes criminal liability for the failure to obtain medical care for a person in custody displaying medical distress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | print number 3056b |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | print number 3056a |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04076 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION